MA S529 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to evidence of coverage to be delivered to covered adults by health, dental and vision care providers. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to administrative simplification
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Forry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2496 |
2017-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/18/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S514 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S551 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S647 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S616 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S557 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1215 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S554 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H598 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S578 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H588 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H576 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H536 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4009
H2162 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H551 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1408 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2496 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4865 (Similar To) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S551 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S647 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S616 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S557 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1215 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S554 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H598 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S578 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H588 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H576 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H536 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4009
H2162 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H551 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1408 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2496 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4865 (Similar To) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S529 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S529.pdf |