MA S498 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2649

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to hunting near a dwelling. Environment and Natural Resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to hunting near a dwelling

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-15SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2649
2023-11-22JointHearing scheduled for 11/29/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources

Same As/Similar To

S2649 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S904 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
H1376 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback