MA S486 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2489
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require local approval for low level radioactive waste sites. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Requiring local approval for low level radioactive waste sites
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2489 |
2017-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S298 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
H3593 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S2489 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3593 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S2489 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S486 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S486.pdf |