MA S483 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to pesticide applications. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to pesticide applications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H899 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S483 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S483.pdf |