MA S481 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2489
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the impacts of municipal water withdrawal permits . Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to municipal water resources
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2489 |
2017-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2017 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in Lenox Town Hall |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S183 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4398
S475 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S426 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H2913
S427 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1678 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1157 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1424 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1534 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1124 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1123 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1574 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S2095 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H423 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
H1372 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2046 (Similar To) 2017-04-05 - See H2783
S2047 (Similar To) 2017-04-05 - See S2046
H10 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4398
S2135 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2096 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - See H3654
H4321 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
S2489 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4613 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - Accompanied H4835
S475 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S426 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H2913
S427 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1678 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1157 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1424 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1534 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1124 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1123 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1574 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S2095 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H423 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
H1372 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2046 (Similar To) 2017-04-05 - See H2783
S2047 (Similar To) 2017-04-05 - See S2046
H10 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4398
S2135 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2096 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - See H3654
H4321 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
S2489 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4613 (Similar To) 2018-07-26 - Accompanied H4835
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S481 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S481.pdf |