MA S463 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to corporations, shareholders, and political expenditures. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to corporate accountability for political spending

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-10JointHearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S631 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S632 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H1182 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Hearing scheduled for 07/27/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H839 (Similar To) 2021-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S454 (Similar To) 2021-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S482 (Similar To) 2021-09-10 - Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 12:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S256 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2710

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback