MA S462 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2489
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the costs imposed upon the municipal and district ratepayers due to public drinking water, wastewater and stormwater systems capital upgrades. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To assist municipal and district ratepayers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2489 |
2017-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2017 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in Lenox Town Hall |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S1864 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1771 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1845 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1855 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2215 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H430 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4526
H463 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
S2489 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1771 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1845 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1855 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2215 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H430 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4526
H463 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
S2489 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S462 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S462.pdf |