MA S458 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2092
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Postponed to the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Postponed to the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to 2030 and 2040 emissions benchmarks. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to 2030 and 2040 emissions benchmarks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Postponed to the next session |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Read second |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 21, 2016 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting thereof a new draft, see S2092 |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S2092 (Replaced by) 2016-01-28 - Passed to be engrossed - Roll Call #234 [YEAS 37 - NAYS 0]
S2121 (Similar To) 2016-02-01 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S642 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1784 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1780 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
H792 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H679 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4648
S2121 (Similar To) 2016-02-01 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S642 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1784 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1780 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
H792 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H679 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4648
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S458 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S458.pdf |