MA S454 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H671
Note: Legislation replaced by S2308
Note: Legislation replaced by S2308
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-3)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to recycling. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to recycling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | Senate | New draft substituted as amended, see S2308 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Postponed to Tuesday, June 28, 2016 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Read second |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, June 9th, 2016 |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2308 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Accompanied by H671 |
2015-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H671 (Replaces) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied S454
S2308 (Replaced by) 2016-06-28 - Reprinted as amended, see S2389
S389 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S2336 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1785 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S410 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S352 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S2308 (Replaced by) 2016-06-28 - Reprinted as amended, see S2389
S389 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S2336 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1785 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S410 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S352 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S454 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S454.pdf |