MA S439 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Accompanied H2944
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Accompanied H2944
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a solid waste council. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to solid waste practices
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Mike Connolly [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Rep. Todd Smola [R] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | Accompanied H2944 |
2017-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S178 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #328 (Yeas 36 to Nays 0)
S417 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S442 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1285 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2686 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2944 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H448 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S417 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S442 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1865 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1285 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2686 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2944 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H448 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S439 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S439.pdf |