MA S433 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2655

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2655
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide a local option for ranked choice voting in municipal elections. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing a local option for ranked choice voting in municipal elections

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-15SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2655
2023-06-14JointHearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S2655 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H711 (Similar To) 2023-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback