MA S410 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4133
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4133
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4133
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission to study the effects of coastal and ocean acidification and its existing and potential effects on species that are commercially harvested and grown along the Massachusetts coast. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Resolve establishing a special commission to study the effects of coastal and ocean acidification and its existing and potential effects on species that are commercially harvested and grown along the Massachusetts coast
Sponsors
Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4133 |
2017-11-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S1173 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1757 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1861 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1303 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1700 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S160 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S164 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1707 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H608 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H1182 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H25 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
S2149 (Similar To) -
H4133 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
S1757 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1861 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S1303 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1700 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S160 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S164 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H1707 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H608 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H1182 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H25 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
S2149 (Similar To) -
H4133 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S410 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S410.pdf |