MA S406 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2116
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2116
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote the viability and sustainability of commercial fisheries in the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To promote the viability and sustainability of commercial fisheries in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2116 |
2013-06-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S2116 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S406 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S406.pdf |