MA S406 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2172
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-20 - New draft substituted, see S2172
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-20 - New draft substituted, see S2172
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Update the animal control laws of Massachusetts
Title
Updating the animal control laws of Massachusetts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-20 | New draft substituted, see S2172 | |
2009-10-20 | New draft substituted, see S2172 | |
2009-10-20 | New draft substituted, see S2172 | |
2009-10-20 | Motion to lay on the table negatived | |
2009-10-15 | Motion to lay on the table pending and postponed to the next session | |
2009-10-15 | Further amendment (Tisei) to the pending amendment rejected 6 YEAS to 27 NAYS (See Senate Roll Call, No. 141) | |
2009-10-15 | Amendment (Jehlen) pending | |
2009-10-15 | Motion to lay on the table negatived | |
2009-10-06 | Motion to lay on the table pending and postponed to the next session | |
2009-10-06 | Pending Ways and Means New Draft S2120 rejected | |
2009-10-06 | Pending Ethics and Rules New Text S2151 rejected | |
2009-09-23 | Postponed to the next session | |
2009-09-21 | Postponed to Wednesday, September 23 | |
2009-09-21 | Read second | |
2009-09-18 | Motion to take out of the Orders of the Day negatived | |
2009-09-17 | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2009-09-17 | Motion to suspend rules negatived | |
2009-09-17 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2151 | |
2009-07-28 | Referred to the committee on Senate Committee On Ethics and Rules | |
2009-07-28 | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2120 | |
2009-06-30 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Committee On Ways and Means | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S2172 (Replaced by) 2010-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S406 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=2280&generalCourtId=2 |