MA S402 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to contribution fairness. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to contribution fairness

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03JointHearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-05-03JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2019-05-02JointHearing rescheduled to 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-04-29JointHearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

H2323 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1970 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1636 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1609 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S2006 (Similar To) 2019-06-20 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1623 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H638 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
H664 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S1615 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H2445 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback