MA S393 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2261
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2261
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the economic value and revenue generation of the Atlantic striped bass. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the economic value and revenue generation of the Atlantic striped bass
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2261 |
2012-02-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/28/2012 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture. |
2011-01-19 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2261 (Replaced by)
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S393 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11848&generalCourtId=1 |