MA S39 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4288

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4288
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect our soil and farms from PFAS contamination. Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting our soil and farms from PFAS contamination

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-29HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4288
2023-05-05JointHearing scheduled for 05/15/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S2474 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4288 (Replaced by) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2623 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday July 31, 2024) adopted, pending concurrence
S2728 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback