MA S379 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4317
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve recycling in the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Improving recycling in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Michael Rodrigues [D] | Rep. Stephen DiNatale [D] | Sen. Michael Knapik [R] |
Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Randy Hunt [R] | Sen. Donald Humason [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4317 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday July 15, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-12-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-07-08 | House | House concurred |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Discharged to the Senate Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
2013-06-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4317 (Replaced by) 2014-07-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S379 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S379.pdf |