MA S37 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H93
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-19 - Accompanied H93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-19 - Accompanied H93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote asset development in transitional assistance programs. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Promoting financial stability and asset development
Sponsors
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. Linda Forry [D] |
Rep. Carl Sciortino [D] | Rep. Thomas Conroy [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | House | Accompanied H93 |
2013-05-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H93 (Replaced by) 2013-06-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S37 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S37.pdf |