MA S366 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2235
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulate the use of off highway and recreation vehicles
Title
To Regulate the Use of Off Highway and Recreation Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-24 | Accompanied a new draft, see S2235 | |
2009-06-11 | House concurred | |
2009-06-10 | Discharged to the committee on Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S2235 (Replaced by) 2010-01-19 - New draft substituted, see S2251
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S366 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=6174&generalCourtId=2 |