MA S361 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2664
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2664
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2664
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand high school student access to earn industry recognized credentials. Education.
Title
Expanding high school student access to earn industry recognized credentials
Sponsors
Sen. John Velis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2664 |
2023-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S334 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2664
S256 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2664
S2664 (Replaced by) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S256 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2664
S2664 (Replaced by) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S361 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S361.pdf |