MA S359 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H696
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H696
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H696
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to plastic bag reduction. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to plastic bag reduction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H696 |
2013-04-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/22/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H696 (Replaced by) 2013-04-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3438
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S359 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S359.pdf |