MA S346 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2345

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a skin cancer and sun safety education program in public schools. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a skin cancer and sun safety education program in public schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-16SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2345
2015-05-26JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S2345 (Replaced by) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S279 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
S318 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1976
S329 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
S1976 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2047
S246 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback