MA S344 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a process to evaluate exposure to catastrophic flooding as a result of climate change. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Creating a process to evaluate exposure to catastrophic flooding as a result of climate change
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-04-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/22/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S344 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S344.pdf |