MA S343 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2666
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an education-to-career data center. Education.
Title
Establishing an education-to-career data center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2666 |
2023-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H530 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4421
H4421 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S2666 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
H4421 (Similar To) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
S2666 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S343 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S343.pdf |