MA S343 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S1857

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2013-09-03 - New draft substituted, see S1857
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to extend the Environmental Joint Powers Agreement that created the A-B-C Stormwater Flooding Board. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending the Environmental Joint Powers Agreement that created the A-B-C Stormwater Flooding Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-03SenateNew draft substituted, see S1857
2013-09-03SenateRead second
2013-09-03SenateRules suspended
2013-09-03SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with an amendment, substituting thereof a new draft, see S1857
2013-06-25SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
2013-03-29JointHearing scheduled for 03/21/2013 from 02:30 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2013-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2013-01-22SenateReferred to the Senate Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S1857 (Replaced by) 2013-11-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 146 of the Acts of 2013

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback