MA S343 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4537

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression
Action: 2012-12-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote healthy communities and the environment. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote healthy communities and the environment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-10HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4537
2012-06-21SenateSenate concurred
2012-06-14HouseReporting date extended to Friday, June 29, 2012
2012-06-14HouseRules suspended
2012-04-26SenateSenate concurred
2012-04-24HouseReporting date extended to Friday, June 1, 2012
2012-04-24HouseRules suspended
2012-03-29SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred committee on Health Care Financing
2012-01-04JointHearing scheduled for 10/25/2011 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in 437
2011-01-24HouseHouse concurred
2011-01-24SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H4537 (Replaced by) 2012-12-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback