MA S341 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-05 - Hearing scheduled for 05/04/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:50 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-05 - Hearing scheduled for 05/04/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:50 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a framework to re-allocate responsibility for discarded products. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To create a framework to re-allocate responsibility for discarded products
Sponsors
Sen. Harriette Chandler [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Cory Atkins [D] | Sen. William Brownsberger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/04/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:50 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture. |
2011-01-21 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S341 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12725&generalCourtId=1 |