MA S3157 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 443 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 443 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Boxford to establish the Boxford small repair grants trust
Title
Authorizing the town of Boxford to establish the Boxford small repair grants trust
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 443 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-12-29 | House | Enacted |
2022-12-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-12-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-12-27 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Substituted for S2935 |
2022-12-22 | Senate | Recommended new draft (Tarr) for S2935 |
Same As/Similar To
S2935 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - New draft substituted (Tarr), see S3157
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3157 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3157.pdf |