MA S305 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2336
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to incentivize efficiencies in the education system of the Commonwealth through the economies of scale. Education.
Title
To incentivize efficiencies in the education system of the Commonwealth through the economies of scale
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2336 |
2015-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2336 (Replaced by) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S302 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S1089 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H1831
S309 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2340
S223 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S255 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S302 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S1089 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H1831
S309 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2340
S223 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S255 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S305 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S305.pdf |