MA S304 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2315
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to strengthening the evaluation process for proposed new charter schools. Education.
Title
An act to strengthen the evaluation process for proposed new charter schools
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Tom Sannicandro [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Paul Brodeur [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2315 |
2015-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-05-19 | House | Hearing on 05/26/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 cancelled |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2315 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S303 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
H426 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
S67 (Similar To) 2015-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S292 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S326 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Ways and Means
S334 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S303 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
H426 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
S67 (Similar To) 2015-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S292 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S326 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Ways and Means
S334 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S304 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S304.pdf |