MA S297 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2017
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to reserving beds in nursing homes for residents during certain leaves of absence. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to reserving beds in nursing homes for residents during certain leaves of absence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2017 |
2013-11-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2013 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2017 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S297 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S297.pdf |