MA S2941 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2668
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 319 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 319 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To modernize public accountancy
Title
To modernize public accountancy
Sponsors
Senate Senate Committee on Ways and Means | House Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 319 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-01-05 | House | Enacted |
2021-01-05 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2021-01-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-01-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2021-01-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-01-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2021-01-04 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-11-10 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-11-05 | Senate | New draft of S2668 |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2668 |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2668 (Replaces) 2020-11-05 - New draft substituted, see S2941
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2941 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2941.pdf |