MA S289 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1975
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide bonus aid to newly formed regional school districts. Education.
Title
Relative to regional bonus aid
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-23 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S1975 |
2015-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1975 (Replaced by) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S290 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1334 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S272 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2341
H1839 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S290 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1334 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S272 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2341
H1839 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S289 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S289.pdf |