MA S287 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1967
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the regulation of skilled nursing facilities. Elder Affairs.
Title
To standardize the regulation of skilled nursing facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2235 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Senate Committee on Health Care Financing |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Accompanied by H1967 |
2014-01-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2014 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H1967 (Replaces) 2014-02-25 - Accompanied S287
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S287 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S287.pdf |