MA S2869 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - Hearing scheduled for 08/07/2020 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Accepting Written Testimony
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to protect working parents during the COVID-19 emergency. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To protect working parents during the COVID-19 emergency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-31JointHearing scheduled for 08/07/2020 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Accepting Written Testimony
2020-07-30HouseHouse concurred
2020-07-27SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2020-07-27SenateRules suspended
2020-06-25SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback