MA S286 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4509
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4509
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4509
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to conduct background checks on residents of nursing and assisted living facilities. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to residents of nursing homes and assisted living facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. George Ross [R] | Sen. Michael Knapik [R] | Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
Rep. Daniel Winslow [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4509 |
2011-11-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2011 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H4509 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S286 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10040&generalCourtId=1 |