MA S2853 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S313
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislation to eliminate the statute of limitation in civil child sexual abuse cases, report the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2853).
Title
Eliminating the statute of limitation in civil child sexual abuse cases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2024-07-11 | Senate | New draft of S313, S916, S1038, S1039, H1446, H1536 and H1614 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Reported from the committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S313 (Replaces) 2024-05-22 - House concurred
S1038 (Similar To) 2024-05-22 - House concurred
H1614 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Senate concurred
H1533 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
S1038 (Similar To) 2024-05-22 - House concurred
H1614 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Senate concurred
H1533 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2853 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2853.pdf |