MA S2848 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S124
Note: Legislation replaced by S3132
Note: Legislation replaced by S3132
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-03 - New draft substituted, see S3132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-03 - New draft substituted, see S3132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to supported decision-making agreements for certain adults with disabilities, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2848).
Title
Relative to supported decision-making agreements for certain adults with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S3132 |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Read second |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S3132 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-04-28 | Senate | New draft of S124 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S124 (Replaces) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2848
H272 (Similar To) 2022-04-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4725
H4725 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S3132 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H272 (Similar To) 2022-04-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4725
H4725 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S3132 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2848 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2848.pdf |