MA S283 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2385
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation for the end of Common Core, and establishing certain other curriculum standards. Education.
Title
For the end of Common Core, and establishing certain other curriculum standards
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2385 |
2017-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H240 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H2022 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H261 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H315 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H267 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H255 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
S2385 (Replaced by) 2018-04-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H2022 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H261 (Similar To) 2018-01-19 - Accompanied S249
H315 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H267 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H255 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
S2385 (Replaced by) 2018-04-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S283 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S283.pdf |