MA S283 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2139
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Accompanied S2139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Accompanied S2139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect the interests of consumers in senior lifestyle communities. Elder Affairs.
Title
To protect the interests of consumers in continuing care resident communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Senate | Accompanied S2139 |
2012-03-22 | House | House concurred |
2012-03-19 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2011-11-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2011 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S2139 (Replaced by) 2013-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2012
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S283 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13760&generalCourtId=1 |