MA S2817 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2875
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2875
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2875
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to an easement in Lynn. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to an easement in Lynn
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-31 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2875 |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2020-07-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/20/2020 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2020-07-13 | House | House concurred |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2875 (Replaced by) 2021-01-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 375 of the Acts of 2021
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2817 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2817.pdf |