MA S2807 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on January 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 275 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on January 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 275 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a gender-neutral charter in the town of Walpole
Title
Providing for a gender-neutral charter in the town of Walpole
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. John Rogers [D] | Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] |
Rep. Louis Kafka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-06 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 275 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-12-30 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-12-29 | House | Enacted |
2020-12-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-09-17 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-09-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-09-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2020-07-13 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Substituted for S2458 |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Recommended new draft (Feeney) for S2458 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2807 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2807.pdf |