MA S2785 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S311
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to implement an elementary and secondary interdisciplinary climate education curriculum in the Commonwealth, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2785).
Title
Implementing an elementary and secondary interdisciplinary climate education curriculum in the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
House Committee on Education | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Sen. John Cronin [D] |
Rep. Jack Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-03-24 | Senate | New draft of S311 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S311 (Replaces) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2785
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S1796 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S292 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S571 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2737
S1853 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S1796 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S292 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S571 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2737
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2785 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2785.pdf |