MA S2785 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-1)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote housing stability and homelessness prevention through a right to counsel pilot program in Massachusetts in response to the COVID-emergency. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting housing stability and homelessness prevention through a right to counsel pilot program in Massachusetts in response to the COVID-emergency

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-16SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2020-07-07JointHearing scheduled for 07/10/2020 from 09:00 AM-04:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
2020-06-25HouseHouse concurred
2020-06-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing
2020-06-22SenateRules suspended
2020-06-11SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback