MA S2783 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Crighton, a petition of Brendan P. Crighton (with approval of the mayor and city council) to amend Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2018 and Sections 6-11 and 10-3 of the Lynn City Charter. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending Chapter 58 of the Acts of 2018 and Sections 6-11 and 10-3 of the Lynn City Charter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-21 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-05-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-05-15 | House | House concurred |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4448 (Similar To) 2024-05-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2024
H4127 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - New draft substituted, see H4448
H3645 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4127 (Similar To) 2024-02-28 - New draft substituted, see H4448
H3645 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2783 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2783.pdf |