MA S2745 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1208
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-1-1)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to end of life options, reports recommending that the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2745) ought to pass.
Title
Relative to end of life options
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-29 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-06-08 | Senate | New draft of S1208 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1208 (Replaces) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2745
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2745 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2745.pdf |