MA S2694 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2794
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2794
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2794
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to retirement benefits for Demetrios Promousas. Public Service.
Title
Relative to retirement benefits for Demetrios Promousas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2794 |
2020-05-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/21/2020 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Electronic Hearing |
2020-05-07 | House | House concurred |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S2794 (Replaced by) 2020-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2694 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2694.pdf |