MA S269 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2807

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2807
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prevent discrimination in interscholastic athletic and extracurricular activities. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent discrimination in interscholastic athletic and extracurricular activities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-06SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2807
2024-05-21SenateSenate concurred
2024-04-22HouseReporting date extended to Sunday May 26, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-28SenateSenate concurred
2024-03-18HouseReporting date extended to Sunday April 21, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-02-29SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Friday March 15, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-04-26JointHearing scheduled for 05/02/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S1035 (Similar To) 2024-05-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2753
H1295 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - House concurred
S2566 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2807 (Replaced by) 2024-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback