MA S2680 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S847
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2-1-1)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislation relative to opioid overdose prevention in college housing, report the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2680).
Title
To support college students in recovery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-04-01 | Senate | New draft of S847 and S849 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S847 (Replaces) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2680
H991 (Similar To) 2023-06-12 - Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
H4362 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S2669 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H10 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H991 (Similar To) 2023-06-12 - Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
H4362 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
S2669 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H10 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2680 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2680.pdf |